Global Patent Index - EP 0831215 B1

EP 0831215 B1 2001-01-24 - Throttle valve control device

Title (en)

Throttle valve control device

Title (de)

Drosselklappensteuerungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de papillon

Publication

EP 0831215 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306863 A

Priority

EP 96306863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831215A1] A throttle drum (40) with a first return spring (54) disposed therearound is rotatably mounted on a throttle shaft (28), and a cruise control drum (60) with a second return spring (72) disposed therearound is rotatably disposed around the throttle drum (40). The throttle drum (40) and the cruise control drum (60) are arranged in a radially double-walled structure around the throttle shaft (28), which may be of a relatively short axial length. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831215 A1 19980325; EP 0831215 B1 20010124; DE 69611673 D1 20010301; DE 69611673 T2 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69611673

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611673 20010301

2001-01-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEIHIN CORPORATION

1998-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

1998-12-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980624

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980523

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI