Global Patent Index - EP 0831236 B1

EP 0831236 B1 2003-06-18 - Motor pump with cooled frequency converter

Title (en)

Motor pump with cooled frequency converter

Title (de)

Motorpumpe mit gekühltem Frequenzumformer

Title (fr)

Motopompe avec convertisseur de fréquence refroidi

Publication

EP 0831236 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116448 A

Priority

DE 19639098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831236A2] The frequency transformer of the pump has a plate (22) formed as a heat sink upon which is attached at least heat generating electronic component. The plate especially lies perpendicularly to the motor's axis of rotation and is cooled by a branched off section of the supply medium. The frequency transformer (20) is attached on the end face of the motor remote from the pump and especially co-axially. A channel runs in or on the plate for the passage of cooling medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/58; F04B 53/08; F04D 15/00; H02K 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/08 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/0686 (2013.01); F04B 53/08 (2013.01); F04D 1/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/5813 (2013.01); F04D 29/588 (2013.01); F04B 2203/0204 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831236 A2 19980325; EP 0831236 A3 19990428; EP 0831236 B1 20030618; EP 0831236 B2 20070815; DE 19639098 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160922

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710298

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150922

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150922

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-12-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-11-21 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-08-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GRUNDFOS A/S

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRUNDFOS A/S

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710298 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2000-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI