Global Patent Index - EP 0831272 B1

EP 0831272 B1 2002-11-13 - Room lighting arrangement

Title (en)

Room lighting arrangement

Title (de)

Raumbeleuchtungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'éclairage d'une pièce

Publication

EP 0831272 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115077 A

Priority

EP 96115077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831272A1] The arrangement has a daylight deflection device (3) extending through a window opening with an artificial light source (4) close by to add to or replace the daylight. The deflector has a trough-shaped, horizontal light conc. device in the form of a first reflector (31,32) on the input side arranged perpendicular to the room axis. A second reflector (35,36) with two curved reflection surfaces is directly adjacent to the first reflector on the light output side and is open towards the ceiling (2). The artificial light source is screened from the viewing direction. The daylight and artificial light are incident on one reflector surface in the same direction and are reflected towards the ceiling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 19/00; F21S 11/00; F21V 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 11/00 (2006.01); F21S 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/0008 (2013.01); F21S 11/00 (2013.01); F21S 19/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831272 A1 19980325; EP 0831272 B1 20021113; AT 227821 T 20021115; DE 59609872 D1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609872 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227821 T 20021115

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

1998-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

1998-12-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980820

1998-09-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI NL