Global Patent Index - EP 0831431 A3

EP 0831431 A3 2000-03-15 - Coin receiving and dispensing machine

Title (en)

Coin receiving and dispensing machine

Title (de)

Gerät zur Einnahme und Ausgabe von Münzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déposer et distribuer des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0831431 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97116388 A

Priority

  • JP 25068096 A
  • JP 25203596 A
  • JP 24883297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831431A2] A coin receiving and dispensing machine includes a coin discriminating and counting section for discriminating whether or not coins are acceptable and the denominations of the acceptable coins and counting the coins, coin sorting sections for sorting coins based on the result of the discrimination made by the coin discriminating and counting section, a coin temporary storing section for temporarily storing acceptable coins sorted by the coin sorting sections in accordance with their denominations, a dispensable coin storing section for receiving coins temporarily stored in the coin temporary storing section and storing them in accordance with their denominations, a safe for collecting coins, and a chute for feeding coins from the dispensable coin storing section to the safe. According to the thus constituted coin receiving and dispensing machine, it is possible to easily collect coins after the completion of business with a compact structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/00; G07D 1/02; G07D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 1/02 (2006.01); G07D 3/02 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2013.01); G07D 1/02 (2013.01); G07D 3/02 (2013.01); G07D 9/008 (2013.01); G07F 5/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831431 A2 19980325; EP 0831431 A3 20000315; EP 0831431 B1 20050525; CN 1082216 C 20020403; CN 1184297 A 19980610; DE 69733334 D1 20050630; DE 69733334 T2 20060126; KR 100274421 B1 20001215; TW 339436 B 19980901; US 5899804 A 19990504

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69733334

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120919

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120919

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110614

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69733334 P 20050630

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 9/00 A, 7G 07D 1/02 B, 7G 07D 3/14 B

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB