Global patent index - EP 0831437 A3

EP 0831437 A3 2000-02-02 - Coin-operated lock

Title (en)

Coin-operated lock

Title (de)

Durch Münzen oder dergleichen betätigtes Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure activée par pièce de monnaie

Publication

EP 0831437 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116506 A

Priority

ES 9602009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831437A2] The lock has a coin diameter matching device (7) fitted in the coin insertion slot (5), to allow the diameter of the acceptable coin (6) for operation of the lock to be altered, with a coin holder defined by the coin diameter matching device and a cooperating pivoted holder (17). The movement of the pivoted holder between the holding position and the release position is controlled in conjunction with the movement of the locking bolt (3), released by a blocking lever (3) when the coin is inserted in the holder. A second holder (31) in the path of the released coin allows the latter to be fed to a return slot or a collection container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01); G07F 17/10 (2006.01); G07F 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0618 (2013.01); G07F 17/10 (2013.01); G07F 17/14 (2013.01); Y10S 70/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831437 A2 19980325; EP 0831437 A3 20000202; BR 9704797 A 19981222; ES 2137827 A1 19991216; ES 2137827 B1 20000801; US 5937991 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050401

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE