Global patent index - EP 0831508 B1

EP 0831508 B1 2001-02-28 - Switching device with juxtaposable auxiliary switch unit

Title (en)

Switching device with juxtaposable auxiliary switch unit

Title (de)

Schaltgerät mit ankoppelbaren Hilfsschalterblock

Title (fr)

Dispositif commutateur avec unité d'interrupteurs auxiliaires juxtaposable

Publication

EP 0831508 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115558 A

Priority

DE 19638422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19638422C1] A switching device, such as a control or actuator relay having a vertical actuation direction in the mounting position, on to which is couplable, frontally, an auxiliary switching unit (5) actuated by the switching device. The switching device (1) has a code characteristic for its design or model and the associated auxiliary switching unit (5), couplable on to the switching device, is matched to the coding (12) with or without a complementary accessory (13). The coding arrangement used is specifically at least one coding pin (12), and the complementary accessory (13) is a coding salience or projection (13) e.g on a fixture lug (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 2300/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19638422 C1 19971106; CN 1065355 C 20010502; CN 1178383 A 19980408; EP 0831508 A2 19980325; EP 0831508 A3 19981118; EP 0831508 B1 20010228

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-12-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031203

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703040

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991222

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981204

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI