Global Patent Index - EP 0831560 B1

EP 0831560 B1 2000-07-26 - Male/female electrical connection with annular seal means

Title (en)

Male/female electrical connection with annular seal means

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckverbindung mit Runddichtung

Title (fr)

Connexion électrique des deux parties mâle et femelle avec joint annulaire

Publication

EP 0831560 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202558 A

Priority

DE 19638590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831560A1] The electric connector is in two parts and consists of a coupling part (10) each exhibiting a receptacle housing (11) and an opposite coupling part (20) which can be coupled thereto. The receptacle (12) in the receptacle housing (11) is used for plugging in a plug-in housing (21) belonging to the opposite coupling part (20). In the coupled state an annular seal between the radial circumferential surface (26) of the plug-in housing (21) and the radial inner surface (16) of the receptacle housing (11) is active. In order to obtain a proper seal which is easy to handle it is proposed that the seal (31) be connected in modular manner to a carrier (32) and this constructional unit (30) be arranged in the annular gap between the circumferential surface (26) of the plug-in housing (21) and the inner surface (16) of the receptacle housing (11). This constructional unit (30) is fixed in the interior of the receptacle housing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5219 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19638590 C1 19980305; EP 0831560 A1 19980325; EP 0831560 B1 20000726; ES 2148897 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702645

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100820

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-04-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-08-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-08-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148897 T3

2000-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702645 20000831

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991013

1998-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980925

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT