Global Patent Index - EP 0831647 B9

EP 0831647 B9 2002-11-27 - MULTIMEDIA OPTICAL DISK ON WHICH AUDIO DATA OF A PLURALITY OF CHANNELS AND SUB-VIDEO DATA TOGETHER WITH TIME-VARYING IMAGE DATA, AND DEVICE AND METHOD OF REPRODUCING THE DATA

Title (en)

MULTIMEDIA OPTICAL DISK ON WHICH AUDIO DATA OF A PLURALITY OF CHANNELS AND SUB-VIDEO DATA TOGETHER WITH TIME-VARYING IMAGE DATA, AND DEVICE AND METHOD OF REPRODUCING THE DATA

Title (de)

OPTISCHE MULTIMEDIA-PLATTE MIT MEHRKANALIGEN AUDIODATEN UND UNTERGEORDNETEN BILDDATEN ZUSAMMEN MIT ZEITLICH VERÄNDERLICHEN BILDDATEN SOWIE DATENWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG DAZU

Title (fr)

DISQUE OPTIQUE MULTIMEDIA CONTENANT DES DONNEES AUDIO D'UNE PLURALITE DE CANAUX, DES DONNEES INFRA-VIDEO ET DES DONNEES D'IMAGES DYNAMIQUES; DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION DESDITES DONNEES

Publication

EP 0831647 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 97914605 A

Priority

  • JP 9701166 W
  • JP 8368696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6088507A] A multimedia optical disc is provided. The multimedia optical disc includes a data area and a management information area. The data area stores a plurality pieces of video data. The management information area stores a channel table in which a plurality of logical channel numbers are respectively related to a plurality of physical channel numbers for each piece of video data. A piece of moving picture data and a plurality pieces of sub-data are interleaved in each piece of video data. The sub-data is either of audio data and sub-picture data as still pictures. The logical channel numbers are shared by pieces of video data. The physical channel numbers are used to physically identify the plurality pieces of sub-data. With this construction, it is possible to manage sub-data even when the sub-data is dealt with by a plurality pieces of video data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/85; G11B 20/10; H04N 5/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09B 5/06 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 9/804 (2006.01); H04N 9/806 (2006.01); H04N 9/82 (2006.01); G11B 7/0037 (2006.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/013 (2006.01); H04N 5/775 (2006.01); H04N 5/85 (2006.01); H04N 5/926 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/8233 (2013.01); G09B 5/065 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 27/3027 (2013.01); G11B 27/309 (2013.01); G11B 27/329 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); H04N 5/9203 (2013.01); H04N 5/9208 (2013.01); H04N 9/8042 (2013.01); H04N 9/8045 (2013.01); H04N 9/8063 (2013.01); H04N 9/8216 (2013.01); G11B 7/0037 (2013.01); G11B 7/007 (2013.01); G11B 7/24085 (2013.01); G11B 2020/10537 (2013.01); G11B 2020/10592 (2013.01); G11B 2220/213 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01); H04N 5/775 (2013.01); H04N 5/85 (2013.01); H04N 5/9262 (2013.01); H04N 9/8205 (2013.01); H04N 9/8227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6088507 A 20000711; CN 1099806 C 20030122; CN 1194753 A 19980930; CN 1232959 C 20051221; CN 1492409 A 20040428; CN 1755820 A 20060405; CN 1755820 B 20110518; DE 69710279 D1 20020321; DE 69710279 T2 20020627; EP 0831647 A1 19980325; EP 0831647 A4 19980701; EP 0831647 B1 20020206; EP 0831647 B9 20021127; EP 1152413 A2 20011107; EP 1152413 A3 20050406; HK 1009032 A1 20020531; ID 16807 A 19971113; JP 3379961 B2 20030224; TW 332890 B 19980601; US 2009103903 A1 20090423; WO 9738527 A1 19971016

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170402

2017-04-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170402

2017-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69710279

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69710279 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980901

1998-07-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971223

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB