Global Patent Index - EP 0831730 B1

EP 0831730 B1 2001-02-21 - ADJUSTABLE WAIST FOR CORRECTING FLAT-FOOTEDNESS

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE WAIST FOR CORRECTING FLAT-FOOTEDNESS

Title (de)

EINSTELLBARE MITTELFÜSSSTÜTZE ZUM KORRIGIEREN VON PLATTFÜSSEN

Title (fr)

CAMBRURE REGLABLE POUR LA CORRECTION DES PIEDS PLATS

Publication

EP 0831730 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96913392 A

Priority

  • BE 9600050 W
  • YU 40495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700028A1] An adjustable waist for correcting flat-footedness, consisting of an anatomically shaped support for the longitudinal arch of the foot (1), an anatomically shaped support for the heel (2), and an anatomically shaped support for the transverse arch of the foot (3). The waist is novel in that the anatomically shaped heel support and the anatomically shaped transverse arch support (3) are movably fitted into cavities (8, 8a) in the anatomically shaped longitudinal arch support (1), in particular by means of projections (7, 7a) thereon, screw heads (9, 9a) and pivots (6, 6a), whereby movable hinges are achieved. A screw (4) with a left-hand thread is screwed into a nut (5) from one side, whereas a screw (4a) with a right-hand thread is screwed into the nut (5) from the other side. The nut (5) is rotated by means of a small spanner (11) in order to set the height of the arch (1a) to the nearest micrometer and thereby correct flat-footedness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/1465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700028 A1 19970103; AU 5640896 A 19970115; DE 69611828 D1 20010329; EP 0831730 A1 19980401; EP 0831730 B1 20010221; YU 40495 A 19970930; YU 48465 B 19980814

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-05-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611828 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR LU

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990415

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR LU