Global Patent Index - EP 0831824 A4

EP 0831824 A4 2001-05-02 - ALPHA 1a ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

ALPHA 1a ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

ALPHA 1a ADRENERGISCHE REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR ADRENERGIQUE ALPHA 1a

Publication

EP 0831824 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96919056 A

Priority

  • US 9608672 W
  • US 47016495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639140A1] This invention relates to certain novel compounds and derivatives thereof, their synthesis, and their use as selective alpha 1a adrenergic receptor antagonists. One application of these compounds is in the treatment of benign prostatic hyperplasia. These compounds are selective in their ability to relax smooth muscle tissue enriched in the alpha 1a receptor subtype without at the same time inducing hypotension. One such tissue is found surrounding the urethral lining. Therefore, one utility of the instant compounds is to provide acute relief to males suffering from benign prostatic hyperplasia, by permitting less hindered urine flow. Another utility of the instant compounds is provided by combination with a human 5-alpha reductase inhibitory compound, such that both acute and chronic relief from the effects of benign prostatic hyperplasia are achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/445; C07D 491/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 5/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/438 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 491/10 (2006.01); C07D 491/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9410989 A1 19940526 - SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP [US], et al
  • [A] US 5206240 A 19930427 - BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9418204 A1 19940818 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [X] YAMATO M ET AL: "SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP OF SPIRO UISOCHROMANPIPERIDINE ANALOGS FOR INHIBITION OF HISTAMINE RELEASE", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN,JP,PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO, vol. 29, no. 12, 1 December 1981 (1981-12-01), pages 3494 - 3498, XP000651856, ISSN: 0009-2363
  • See also references of WO 9639140A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639140 A1 19961212; AU 6149796 A 19961224; AU 705661 B2 19990527; CA 2221842 A1 19961212; EP 0831824 A1 19980401; EP 0831824 A4 20010502; JP 2001516330 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000703

2001-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980107

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE