Global Patent Index - EP 0831854 A4

EP 0831854 A4 2001-01-24 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES HAVING PHOSPHOROTHIOATE LINKAGES OF HIGH CHIRAL PURITY

Title (en)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES HAVING PHOSPHOROTHIOATE LINKAGES OF HIGH CHIRAL PURITY

Title (de)

OLIGONUKLEOTIDE MIT PHOSPHOROTHIOAT-BINDUNGEN VON HOHER CHIRALER REINHEIT

Title (fr)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES DE GRANDE PURETE CHIRALE AYANT DES LIAISONS PHOSPHOROTHIOATE

Publication

EP 0831854 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96921270 A

Priority

  • US 9608757 W
  • US 47196795 A
  • US 46759795 A
  • US 46844795 A
  • US 46856995 A
  • US 46669295 A
  • US 47196695 A
  • US 46985195 A
  • US 47012995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639154A1] Sequence-specific phosphorothioate oligonucleotides comprising nucleoside units which are joined together by either substantially all Sp or substantially all Rp phosphorothioate intersugar linkages are provided. Such sequence-specific phosphorothioate oligonucleotides having substantially chirally pure intersugar linkages are prepared by enzymatic or chemical synthesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70; C07H 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 31/7125 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1131 (2013.01); C12N 15/1132 (2013.01); C12N 15/1133 (2013.01); C12N 15/1135 (2013.01); C12N 15/1137 (2013.01); C12N 15/1138 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DXY] WO 9308296 A1 19930429 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]
  • [Y] WO 9405813 A1 19940317 - ETO TATSUO [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9506659 A1 19950309 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9408003 A1 19940414 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9203139 A1 19920305 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9502069 A1 19950119 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [X] VAKITA T ET AL: "SPECIFIC INHIBITION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS EXPRESSION BY ANTISENSE OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES : IN VITRO MODEL FOR SELECTION OF TARGET SEQUENCE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 269, no. 19, 13 May 1994 (1994-05-13), pages 14205 - 14210, XP000604710, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [DA] STEC W J ET AL: "NOVEL ROUTE TO OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHOROTHIOATES STEREOCONTROLLED SYNTHESIS OF P-CHIRAL OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHOROTHIOATES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 19, no. 21, 1991, pages 5883 - 5888, XP002145738, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [PX] ALT M ET AL: "SPECIFIC INHIBITION OF HEPATITIS C VIRAL GENE EXPRESSION BY ANTISENSE PHOPHOROTHIOATE OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES", HEPATOLOGY, vol. 22, no. 3, 1 September 1995 (1995-09-01), pages 707 - 717, XP000603288, ISSN: 0270-9139
  • [PX] SEKI MAKOTO ET AL: "Phosphorothioate antisense oligodeoxynucleotides capable of inhibiting hepatitis C virus gene expression: In vitro translation assay.", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY (TOKYO), vol. 118, no. 6, December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 1199 - 1204, XP002145739, ISSN: 0021-924X
  • [PX] MIZUTANI T ET AL: "INHIBITION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS REPLICATION BY ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE IN CULTURE CELLS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 212, no. 3, 26 July 1995 (1995-07-26), pages 906 - 911, XP000604711, ISSN: 0006-291X
  • [T] MONIA B P ET AL: "ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF A PHOSPHOROTHIOATE ANTISENSE OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE TARGETED AGAINST C-RAF KINASE", NATURE MEDICINE, vol. 2, no. 6, 6 June 1996 (1996-06-06), pages 668 - 675, XP002073792, ISSN: 1078-8956
  • See also references of WO 9639154A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639154 A1 19961212; AU 6252896 A 19961224; AU 698739 B2 19981105; CA 2223103 A1 19961212; EP 0831854 A1 19980401; EP 0831854 A4 20010124; JP 2001103987 A 20010417; JP 2001114798 A 20010424; JP H10510433 A 19981013; NO 975558 A 19980126; NO 975558 D0 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041224

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020528

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COOK, PHILLIP, DAN

1998-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOKE, GLENN

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971218

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE