Global Patent Index - EP 0831866 A4

EP 0831866 A4 2000-04-26 - PINEAL GLAND SPECIFIC GENE-1

Title (en)

PINEAL GLAND SPECIFIC GENE-1

Title (de)

ZIRBELDRÜSE SPEZIFISCHES GEN-1

Title (fr)

GENE 1 SPECIFIQUE DE LA GLANDE PINEALE

Publication

EP 0831866 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95922956 A

Priority

US 9507067 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639158A1] Human pineal gland specific gene-1 polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptides and a procedure is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptides for the regulation of the pituitary gland and to modulate biological rhythms. Agonists and antagonists against such polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to control the actions of such polypeptides are also disclosed. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting mutations in the polynucleotides encoding the polypeptides and for detecting altered levels of the polypeptide in a host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; C07H 21/04; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/575 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0409472 A1 19910123 - CHIRON CORP [US]
  • [XY] P.J. NEAME ET AL.,: "The Structure of a 38-kDa Leucine-rich Protein (Chondroadherin) Isolated from Bovine Cartilage", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 269, no. 34, 26 August 1994 (1994-08-26), US, pages 21547 - 21554, XP000872937
  • [XY] B. HU ET AL.,: "Isolation and Molecular Cloning of a Novel Bone Phosphoprotein Related in Sequence to the Cystatin Family of Thiol Protease Inhibitors", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 270, no. 1, 6 January 1995 (1995-01-06), US, pages 431 - 436, XP000872932
  • See also references of WO 9639158A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639158 A1 19961212; AU 2766095 A 19961224; AU 716415 B2 20000224; EP 0831866 A1 19980401; EP 0831866 A4 20000426; JP 2000502241 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060206

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031128

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971121

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE