EP 0832126 A4 20000112 - G-PROTEIN RECEPTOR HTNAD29
Title (en)
G-PROTEIN RECEPTOR HTNAD29
Title (de)
G-PROTEIN REZEPTOR HTNAD29
Title (fr)
HTNAD29 RECEPTEURS DE PROTEINES G
Publication
Application
Priority
US 9507288 W 19950606
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9639442A1] Human G-protein PAF receptor polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptides and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptides for identifying antagonists and agonists to such polypeptides and methods of using the agonists and antagonists therapeutically to treat conditions related to the underexpression and overexpression of the PAF receptor polypeptides. Also disclosed are diagnostic methods for detecting a mutation in the PAF receptor nucleic acid sequences and detecting a level of the soluble form of the receptors in a sample derived from a host.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
A61P 7/02 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 9/08 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 9/10 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 29/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 37/08 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2017.12 - EP); C07K 14/705 (2013.01 - EP KR); C07K 14/723 (2013.01 - EP); C07K 16/28 (2013.01 - KR); C12N 15/11 (2013.01 - KR); A61K 48/00 (2013.01 - EP); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [YA] WO 9405695 A1 19940317 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
- [Y] WO 9307294 A1 19930415 - US HEALTH [US]
- [Y] WO 9312134 A1 19930624 - HARVARD COLLEGE [US]
- [E] WO 9627603 A1 19960912 - MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]
- [AD] WO 9201810 A1 19920206 - LERNER MICHAEL R [US], et al
- [XY] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121362, Database accession no. T87010 & DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121817, Database accession no. P32250
- [X] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121363, Database accession no. T86932
- [A] OLIVEIRA L. ET AL.: "A common motif in G-protein-coupled seven transmembrane helix receptors", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, vol. 7, no. 6, 1 December 1993 (1993-12-01), pages 649 - 658, XP002050853, ISSN: 0920-654X
- [A] LEE N.H. AND KERLAVAGE A.R.: "Molecular biology of G-protein-coupled receptors", DRUG NEWS AND PERSPECTIVES, vol. 6, no. 7, 1 September 1993 (1993-09-01), pages 488 - 497, XP000677175, ISSN: 0214-0934
- See references of WO 9639442A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9639442 A1 19961212; AU 2820495 A 19961224; AU 714642 B2 20000106; CA 2221706 A1 19961212; CN 1147505 C 20040428; CN 1193980 A 19980923; EP 0832126 A1 19980401; EP 0832126 A4 20000112; JP H11506341 A 19990608; KR 19990022531 A 19990325
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9507288 W 19950606; AU 2820495 A 19950606; CA 2221706 A 19950606; CN 95197925 A 19950606; EP 95923763 A 19950606; JP 50037996 A 19950606; KR 19970709012 A 19971206