Global Patent Index - EP 0832126 A4

EP 0832126 A4 2000-01-12 - G-PROTEIN RECEPTOR HTNAD29

Title (en)

G-PROTEIN RECEPTOR HTNAD29

Title (de)

G-PROTEIN REZEPTOR HTNAD29

Title (fr)

HTNAD29 RECEPTEURS DE PROTEINES G

Publication

EP 0832126 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95923763 A

Priority

US 9507288 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639442A1] Human G-protein PAF receptor polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptides and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptides for identifying antagonists and agonists to such polypeptides and methods of using the agonists and antagonists therapeutically to treat conditions related to the underexpression and overexpression of the PAF receptor polypeptides. Also disclosed are diagnostic methods for detecting a mutation in the PAF receptor nucleic acid sequences and detecting a level of the soluble form of the receptors in a sample derived from a host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C07K 14/723 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] WO 9405695 A1 19940317 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
  • [Y] WO 9307294 A1 19930415 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [Y] WO 9312134 A1 19930624 - HARVARD COLLEGE [US]
  • [E] WO 9627603 A1 19960912 - MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]
  • [AD] WO 9201810 A1 19920206 - LERNER MICHAEL R [US], et al
  • [XY] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121362, Database accession no. T87010 & DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121817, Database accession no. P32250SWISSPROT19000101P32250
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002121363, Database accession no. T86932
  • [A] OLIVEIRA L. ET AL.: "A common motif in G-protein-coupled seven transmembrane helix receptors", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, vol. 7, no. 6, 1 December 1993 (1993-12-01), pages 649 - 658, XP002050853, ISSN: 0920-654X
  • [A] LEE N.H. AND KERLAVAGE A.R.: "Molecular biology of G-protein-coupled receptors", DRUG NEWS AND PERSPECTIVES, vol. 6, no. 7, 1 September 1993 (1993-09-01), pages 488 - 497, XP000677175, ISSN: 0214-0934
  • See also references of WO 9639442A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639442 A1 19961212; AU 2820495 A 19961224; AU 714642 B2 20000106; CA 2221706 A1 19961212; CN 1147505 C 20040428; CN 1193980 A 19980923; EP 0832126 A1 19980401; EP 0832126 A4 20000112; JP H11506341 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060607

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971230

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE