Global patent index - EP 0832399 B1

EP 0832399 B1 2000-01-12 - CATALYTIC IGNITION BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

CATALYTIC IGNITION BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

KATALYTISCHE ZÜNDBRENNER EINER GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

BRULEUR D'ALLUMAGE CATALYTIQUE POUR TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0832399 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96917334 A

Priority

  • DE 9601019 W
  • DE 19521309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9641991A1] According to the invention a burner, especially for a gas turbine, is designed for the catalytically induced combustion of a fuel, in which the fuel outlet of a catalytic auxiliary burner (6) to stabilise the main burner (8) with the catalytic combustion of a pilot fuel flow is provided in the direction of flow of the fuel in a flow channel, in front of the fuel outlet of the main burner (8). The replacement of a diffusion pilot flame by a catalytic auxiliary burner substantially reduces the nitrogen oxide emission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/40; F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23C 13/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/18 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 13/00 (2013.01); F23C 13/08 (2013.01); F23R 3/343 (2013.01); F23R 3/40 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9641991 A1 19961227; DE 59604180 D1 20000217; EP 0832399 A1 19980401; EP 0832399 B1 20000112; ES 2142588 T3 20000416; IN 191368 B 20031129; JP 4063871 B2 20080319; JP H11509307 A 19990817; RU 2149317 C1 20000520

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-12-18 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-12-18 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20020131

2002-09-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CH

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142588

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604180

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990609

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971204

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE