Global patent index - EP 0832411 B1

EP 0832411 B1 2000-01-19 - CAPILLARY PUMPED HEAT TRANSFER LOOP

Title (en)

CAPILLARY PUMPED HEAT TRANSFER LOOP

Title (de)

WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSKREISLAUF MIT KAPILLAREN PUMPEN

Title (fr)

BOUCLE A POMPAGE CAPILLAIRE DE TRANSPORT DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 0832411 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96918533 A

Priority

  • BE 9600061 W
  • BE 9500530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700416A1] A capillary pumped heat transfer loop including an evaporator, a condenser and a tank for storing a heat transfer fluid, said evaporator being provided with a porous material for generating capillary pumping pressure within the loop. Said tank and said evaporator are mutually thermally insulated and interconnected via a channel that comprises a first portion consisting of a capillary connection for pumping the heat transfer fluid from the tank to the porous material, and a second portion for conveying gas bubbles and/or steam from the evaporator to the tank, said tank being arranged to be kept at a lower temperature than the evaporator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700416 A1 19970103; AU 6116996 A 19970115; BE 1009410 A3 19970304; DE 69606296 D1 20000224; DE 69606296 T2 20000810; EP 0832411 A1 19980401; EP 0832411 B1 20000119; US 5944092 A 19990831; US 5944092 C1 20010612

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-12-07 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2004-10-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-10-27 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20040609

2003-09-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-06-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-06-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030617

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-09-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EURO HEAT PIPES S.A.

2002-01-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: EURO HEAT PIPES S.A.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SWALES AEROSPACE

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SWALES AEROSPACE

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606296

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990317

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE