Global patent index - EP 0832537 A4

EP 0832537 A4 2000-10-18 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSERTING STATIC AND DYNAMIC IMAGES INTO A LIVE VIDEO BROADCAST

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSERTING STATIC AND DYNAMIC IMAGES INTO A LIVE VIDEO BROADCAST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINFÜGEN VON DYNAMISCHEN UND STATISCHEN BILDERN IN EINER ECHTZEITVIDEOÜBERTRAGUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'INSERTION D'IMAGES DYNAMIQUES ET STATIQUES DANS UNE EMISSION VIDEO EN DIRECT

Publication

EP 0832537 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96921559 A

Priority

  • US 9610163 W
  • US 27995 P
  • US 56359895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700581A1] A live video insertion system efficiently places static (186) or dynamic images into a live broadcast. The system initially identifies natural landmarks within the video scene that can be automatically identified and tracked as the field of view of the camera pans and zooms across the scene. The locations of the landmarks are mathematically modeled and stored as a constellation of locations on a mathematical grid. An arbitrary reference point, preferably not necessarily coincident with a selected natural landmark, is located within or without the grid and used as an origin for the purpose of inserting the static (186) or dynamic image within the field of view of the camera. For static images, it is frequently desirable to place an edge or border of the image to be inserted on the reference point. For dynamic insertions, the distance between the reference point and the inserted dynamic image is automatically changed from frame to frame in order to make the image appear as though it's translating or changing, or both.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 9/74; H04N 5/272

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/265 (2006.01); H04N 5/272 (2006.01); H04N 9/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/2723 (2013.01); H04N 5/272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700581 A1 19970103; AU 6276096 A 19970115; BR 9609169 A 19991214; EP 0832537 A1 19980401; EP 0832537 A4 20001018; JP H11507796 A 19990706; MX 9710191 A 19981031; PE 18698 A1 19980504

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-12-03 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLILUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030204

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04N 9/74 A, 7H 04N 5/272 B

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980105

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE