Global Patent Index - EP 0832576 B1

EP 0832576 B1 2000-02-16 - Make-up container

Title (en)

Make-up container

Title (de)

Kosmetikbehälter

Title (fr)

Boîtier, du type boîtier de maquillage

Publication

EP 0832576 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401631 A

Priority

FR 9610726 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832576A1] The box comprises two parts a cover and a bottom the cover being articulated to the bottom. The articulation system comprises a first ramp (22) which is carried by the cover and formed by a surface centred on the articulation axis (A). A second ramp (33) is carried by the bottom and has a complementary profile to that of the first. It is located so as to engage the first ramp during pivoting of the cover relative to the bottom. A spring constrains the first ramp supported against the second along the articulation axis. The ramps have a profile symmetrical about the articulation axis. Each profile presents a succession of hollows (25,26,31,32) and alternate crests (23,24,29,30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/34; A45D 40/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/34 (2006.01); A45D 40/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/22 (2013.01); A45C 13/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2752699 A1 19980306; FR 2752699 B1 19981016; DE 69701305 D1 20000323; DE 69701305 T2 20000621; EP 0832576 A1 19980401; EP 0832576 B1 20000216; ES 2144299 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-07-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040708

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040708

2003-08-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144299 T3

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701305 20000323

2000-02-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980716

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971219

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT