Global Patent Index - EP 0832578 A3

EP 0832578 A3 2000-06-28 - Applicator device for toilet water, perfume and the like

Title (en)

Applicator device for toilet water, perfume and the like

Title (de)

Auftragsvorrichtung für Toilettenwasser, Parfüm und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application pour eau de toilette, parfum ou analogue

Publication

EP 0832578 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115013 A

Priority

  • DE 19635262 A
  • DE 29615159 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832578A2] The applicator has a housing (1) with reservoir (5) and a plastic capillary element (6). The element has an axial flange carrier with flange sections, and axial narrow groove and diametrically opposite wide groove. Wick is fitted into an axial bore at the end of the element opposite to the reservoir. The bore is in connection with the narrow groove via a connection opening. The wick has a concave holder surface for a ball (2). The ball is turnably held in the front housing end, forming an air passage (3), which is in connection with the wide groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; A45D 34/00; A45D 34/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832578 A2 19980401; EP 0832578 A3 20000628; EP 0832578 B1 20020703; DE 19635262 A1 19980305; DE 19635262 C2 19980723; DE 29615159 U1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-15 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050829

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59707632 20020808

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45D 34/04 A, 7A 45D 34/02 B, 7A 45D 34/00 B

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI