Global Patent Index - EP 0832580 B1

EP 0832580 B1 2001-12-05 - Brush for application of a cosmetic product and a make-up device with such a brush

Title (en)

Brush for application of a cosmetic product and a make-up device with such a brush

Title (de)

Bürste für die Applikation von kosmetischen Produkten und ein Make-upvorrichtung damit versehen

Title (fr)

Brosse pour l'application d'un produit cosmétique et dispositif de maquillage la comprenant

Publication

EP 0832580 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402120 A

Priority

FR 9611752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832580A1] An applicator brush consists of a straight shaft and a bristle head (225) with a flexible wire core (122). The bristles are attached radially to the core, which is curved in shape, and at least part of the bristle head has a cross-section which is elongated in shape, with its longer axis lying perpendicular to the plane of the curve. The sides of the bristle head on the inside and outside of the curve can have curved or flat surfaces. The curvature of the head is in the form of an arc of a circle, and the elongated portion of its cross-section covers at least 50 or 75 per cent of its length. In variants of the design the initial shape of the bristle head can be in the form of a cylinder, a section of a cone, a rugby ball, a buoy, a fish, a peanut, an artillery shell or a teardrop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 2/48 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/18 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/18 (2013.01); A46B 9/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832580 A1 19980401; EP 0832580 B1 20011205; AR 009090 A1 20000308; BR 9702922 A 19981229; CA 2215216 A1 19980326; CA 2215216 C 20001121; CN 1106182 C 20030423; CN 1187964 A 19980722; DE 69708811 D1 20020117; DE 69708811 T2 20020418; ES 2169332 T3 20020701; FR 2753614 A1 19980327; FR 2753614 B1 19981030; JP 2918518 B2 19990712; JP H10113217 A 19980506; MX 9707284 A 19980830; US 5937870 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170911

2017-10-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170911

2017-09-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69708811

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169332 T3

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708811 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

1998-12-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI