Global Patent Index - EP 0832581 A3

EP 0832581 A3 2000-05-10 - Underframe for table

Title (en)

Underframe for table

Title (de)

Tischuntergestell

Title (fr)

Piètement pour table

Publication

EP 0832581 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116580 A

Priority

DE 29616744 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832581A2] The frame (2) is supported on the ground by leg frames (6) each having horizontal support rails (14) to support the tabletop (4). These rails are connected directly to cross beams (16,18) and directly adjoining their connecting points with same have socket sleeves (32,34) for the supporting legs (8,10) of the leg frame. The cross-sections of the sleeves is such that the upper end areas (22,26) of each support leg fit in same with play and can then be placed under force through a clamping device along two bearing lines against the inner circumferential surface of the sleeve. The cross beams fit in socket openings (36,38) in the support rails.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/02 (2006.01); A47B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/02 (2013.01); A47B 17/00 (2013.01); A47B 13/003 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0012 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29616744 U1 19961114; EP 0832581 A2 19980401; EP 0832581 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-02-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE