Global Patent Index - EP 0832625 A3

EP 0832625 A3 2000-02-02 - Hinge with locking means

Title (en)

Hinge with locking means

Title (de)

Gelenk mit Mitteln zur Blockierung

Title (fr)

Charnière avec moyens de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0832625 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97307456 A

Priority

  • GB 9619968 A
  • US 93167797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832625A2] A uniaxial orthopaedic hinge (1000, 2000) has a substantially circular body forming a recessed housing (1022, 2022). A back plate (1006, 2006) has an extension into a stub arm (1004, 2004) for attaching to the arm of an orthosis and is fixed to the recessed housing (1022, 2022). A locking plate (1008, 2008) also has an extension into a stub arm (1002, 2002) and is disposed in a parallel manner between the recessed housing (1022, 2022) and the back plate (1006, 2006). The circular recessed housing (1022, 2022) is provided with a recess (1100, 2100) housing a lock actuator (1102, 2102) having a latching dog (1126, 2126) and also fitted with a biasing leaf spring (1104, 2104). The latching dog (1126, 2126) co-operates with a latching hole (1128, 2128) in the locking plate (1008, 2008) when the hinge (1000, 2000) is in the fully extended position. A lifting cam (1110, 2110) underlies the lock actuator (1102, 2102)and has a cam lifting lever which extends through the face of the circular recessed housing (1022, 2022). The cam lifting lever is moved through about 90 DEG to release the latching dog (1126, 2126) so that the hinge (1000, 2000) may move with free or controlled motion. When the cam lifting lever is switched to the "on" position, the latching dog (1126, 2126) is brought into contact with the locking plate (1008, 2008) under the influence of the spring (1104, 2104). The hinge (1000, 2000) moves freely unless it is fully extended, at which point the latching dog (1126, 2126) once again engages the locking plate (1008, 2008), locking the hinge mechanism (1000, 2000) in full extension. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 5/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 5/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 5/0125 (2013.01); A61F 2005/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832625 A2 19980401; EP 0832625 A3 20000202; GB 9619968 D0 19961113; US 5997493 A 19991207; US 6004283 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSN MEDICAL, INC.

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB