Global patent index - EP 0832696 A3

EP 0832696 A3 2000-01-26 - Flushing, sanifying, pickling and degreasing system using steam

Title (en)

Flushing, sanifying, pickling and degreasing system using steam

Title (de)

System zum Spülen, Sanieren, Beizen und Entfetten mittels Dampf

Title (fr)

Système pour rincer, assainir, décaper et dégraisser au moyen de vapeur

Publication

EP 0832696 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97200580 A

Priority

IT TO960799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832696A2] Flushing, sanifying, pickling and degreasing system using steam, composed of a unit equipped with a saturated, high temperature steam source (1); in parallel, a water circuit (5) supplies a water mixing system (3) with detergents (7), pickling agents, phosphating agents (9), protective agents (11) and the like; everything, saturated steam plus mixture, used downstream of the unit as desired in an automatic plant (23) or by means of a handle (25) that allows an operator to choose operation type and mixture type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2013.01); B08B 2230/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832696 A2 19980401; EP 0832696 A3 20000126; EP 0832696 B1 20030312; DE 69719651 D1 20030417; DE 69719651 T2 20040408; ES 2193325 T3 20031101; IT 1285004 B1 19980528; IT TO960799 A1 19980330

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050227

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050227

2004-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-03-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040301

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-02-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-01-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-01-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193325

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KEMIA S.A.

2003-06-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69719651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030417

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

2003-03-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI