Global patent index - EP 0832720 A3

EP 0832720 A3 2000-12-13 - Grinding disc for hand-held grinding machine, especially cutting disc

Title (en)

Grinding disc for hand-held grinding machine, especially cutting disc

Title (de)

Schleifscheibe für handgeführte Schleifmaschinen, insbesondere Trenn-Schleifscheibe

Title (fr)

Disque de meulage pour meuleuse portative, en particulier disque de tronçonnage

Publication

EP 0832720 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121891 A

Priority

  • DE 4304513 A
  • DE 4311529 A
  • EP 94100690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832720A2] The grinding disc for a manual grinder, an abrasive cutter, has a recess (3) in the ring-disc grinding ring (1), concentric to a central longitudinal axis (4). The ring disc carrier (2) is fitted into the recess (3) and bonded to the grinding ring (1). The grinding ring (1) projects over the end side (6) of the carrier (2), at least at one side (5). The grinding ring (1) and the carrier (2) are adhesive bonded together, with an adhesive layer filling the gap between the outer surface of the carrier and the inner surface of the recess, using an epoxy resin adhesive. The facing surfaces of the recess and the carrier are cylindrical.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 5/12; B24D 5/16; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/12 (2006.01); B24D 5/16 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/12 (2013.01); B24D 5/16 (2013.01); B24D 18/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4311529 A1 19940818; EP 0832720 A2 19980401; EP 0832720 A3 20001213; ZA 9400753 B 19940929

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 24D 5/12 A, 7B 24D 5/16 B, 7B 24D 18/00 B

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ALFER, PETER

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SINRAM, DIETHARD, DR.

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, THEODOR

1998-04-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 612586

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE