Global Patent Index - EP 0832722 B1

EP 0832722 B1 2000-11-15 - Device for clamping and drilling

Title (en)

Device for clamping and drilling

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Klemmen und Bohren

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le serrage et le perçage

Publication

EP 0832722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113087 A

Priority

DE 19639122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832722A1] The appliance has a clamping part (2) and a drilling part (15) positioned on a basic body (6). The clamping part has a clamp strap (3) movable from an open start position into a clamping position by means of its clamping element (9) pointing axially towards the operating point (13) contrary to the forward thrust direction. The drilling part has a drilling machine (16) with drill (17) and which is movable towards the operating point from the starting position by means of a forward thrust drive connected to the clamping cylinder (4). One end (8) of the clamp strap moves in at least one longitudinal guide (11,12) by means of a clamping cylinder; the opposite pipe end forms the clamping element near the operating point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 1/00; B21J 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/10 (2006.01); B25H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 1/0057 (2013.01); B21J 15/10 (2013.01); Y10T 408/5627 (2013.01); Y10T 408/563 (2013.01); Y10T 408/5653 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832722 A1 19980401; EP 0832722 B1 20001115; DE 19639122 A1 19980402; US 5961258 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120730

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERBREVETTI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702634

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-03-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AIRBUS GESELLSCHAFT MIT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-12-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

1998-12-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980127

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE