Global Patent Index - EP 0832801 B1

EP 0832801 B1 2002-12-18 - Hydraulic control apparatus

Title (en)

Hydraulic control apparatus

Title (de)

Hydraulische Steuereinheit

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 0832801 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97116790 A

Priority

  • JP 25426296 A
  • JP 14400397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832801A2] In a solenoid valve 3, a coil 4 is disposed on the electronic control unit 2 side, and is resin injection molded integrally to a resin case 5 housing a circuit board 9 on which electronic components 19 and 19' are mounted. Before a hydraulic control unit 1 and electronic control unit 2 are connected, an end of a connecting pin 10 for the coil 4 is electrically connected by soldering or other means to wiring of circuit board 9, and a cover 20 of similar material is pressed to and welded with resin case 5 to assure a waterproof structure around the circuit board 9. Finally, a magnetic member 6 or magnetic plate 28 constituting part of a magnetic circuit provided separately to or integrally molded with resin case 5 is fastened by a bolt 21 to unitarily connect both units. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/34 (2006.01); B60T 8/36 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/3675 (2013.01); Y10T 137/87217 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832801 A2 19980401; EP 0832801 A3 19990120; EP 0832801 B1 20021218; DE 69717934 D1 20030130; DE 69717934 T2 20030731; JP 3250488 B2 20020128; JP H10152035 A 19980609; US 5988772 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717934

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080926

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080926

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717934 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717934 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001207

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI