Global Patent Index - EP 0832827 B1

EP 0832827 B1 2001-12-19 - Self-closing connection device for containers

Title (en)

Self-closing connection device for containers

Title (de)

Selbstverriegelndes Verbindungselement für Container

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion auto-obturant pour contenants

Publication

EP 0832827 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101562 A

Priority

  • DE 29617029 U
  • DE 29621266 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832827A2] The containers have locking holes (3,4) formed in the region of the corners, and a housing (5) and two locking heads (7,8). One upper locking head (7) is retained to swivel in one locking hole (3) of one of the containers. The other lower locking head (8) may be in a swivelled position (8a). An axis (X-X) running through both locking heads is inclined in relation to an axis (Y-Y) running perpendicularly through the locking hole (4) of the other container (2). The lower locking head can be fitted in, or withdrawn from, the locking hole of the second container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 25/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0013 (2013.01); B63B 25/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0832827 A2 19980401; EP 0832827 A3 19991110; EP 0832827 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WILLI ADER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705863 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991030

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE