Global Patent Index - EP 0832836 B1

EP 0832836 B1 2001-05-02 - Pocket with adjustable height for a sheet conveying device

Title (en)

Pocket with adjustable height for a sheet conveying device

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Tasche für eine Bogenmaterial-Fördervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Poche à hauteur réglable pour un dispositif de transport de feuilles

Publication

EP 0832836 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115082 A

Priority

US 71986396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0832836A2] A cam roller (176) is mounted on each pocket (10) on which it moves. Each pocket has a top end (50) through which the sheet material enters the pocket, and has a bottom end (60) through which the sheet material emerges from the pocket. The sheet material is supported in the pocket by a support device (70,72,74). The support device is moved from an open position into a selected closed position by means of a gearing (80,120,130) in reaction to the movement of the cam roller on the pocket. The gearing consists of a toothed bar (80) engaging with a pinion (120).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 1/10 (2006.01); B65H 39/02 (2006.01); B65H 39/043 (2006.01); B65H 39/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4321 (2013.01); B65H 2403/41 (2013.01); B65H 2403/47 (2013.01); B65H 2511/15 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/15 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/04 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738086 A1 19980326; CN 1064639 C 20010418; CN 1177565 A 19980401; DE 59703465 D1 20010607; EP 0832836 A2 19980401; EP 0832836 A3 19981111; EP 0832836 B1 20010502; HK 1009117 A1 20010817; JP 4024356 B2 20071219; JP H10114464 A 19980506; US 5911416 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703465

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2004-04-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2002-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703465 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970901

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI