Global Patent Index - EP 0832942 A3

EP 0832942 A3 2000-05-31 - Dyes for color filters, photosensitive resist resin compositions containing the same, and color filters

Title (en)

Dyes for color filters, photosensitive resist resin compositions containing the same, and color filters

Title (de)

Farbstoffe für Farbfilter, diese Farbstoffe enthaltende photoempfindliche Resistzusammensetzungen sowie entsprechende Farbfilter

Title (fr)

Colorants pour filtres couleur, résine photosensibles contenant ces colorants, ainsi que filtres couleurs correspondants

Publication

EP 0832942 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97118306 A

Priority

  • EP 92311343 A
  • JP 32847491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0546856A2] Dyes suitable for use in the fabrication of color filters are described. They contain one or more photopolymerizable substituents which may preferably be represented by the following formula: <MATH> wherein D represents a chromophoric nucleus, A denotes a connecting group, Y means the photopolymerizable group, n<1> is 1-10000, and n<2> stands for an integer of 1-10. Also described are photosensitive resist resin compositions containing the dyes as well as color filters fabricated by curing the photosensitive resist resin compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09B 69/10; G03C 7/12; G03F 7/00; G03F 7/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 69/10 (2006.01); G02B 5/20 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09B 69/10 (2013.01); G03F 7/0007 (2013.01); G03F 7/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0546856 A2 19930616; EP 0546856 A3 19940525; EP 0546856 B1 20010822; DE 69232015 D1 20010927; DE 69232015 T2 20020418; EP 0832942 A2 19980401; EP 0832942 A3 20000531; JP H05271567 A 19931019

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ITOH, HISATO

1998-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARASAWA, AKIO

1998-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIMOTO, KENICHI

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.

1998-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ITOH, HISATO

1998-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARASAWA, AKIO

1998-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIMOTO, KENICHI

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971111

1998-04-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 546856

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL