Global Patent Index - EP 0833024 B1

EP 0833024 B1 2002-12-11 - Cylinder lock

Title (en)

Cylinder lock

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 0833024 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114725 A

Priority

DE 19639249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19639249C1] The cylinder core (4) with keyhole (3) turns in a housing (2), and is locked by tumblers (5) to an enclosing bush (6) on extraction of the key. The core has an overload coupling (7) detaching an output section (8) from it on turning by a wrong key or a tool. The coupling has one or more driving dogs (11,12) sliding in the radial direction and turning with the core, these bearing in the outwards direction against the output section and engaging in recesses in it. The coupling is controlled by a ring (9) sliding in the lengthwise direction but not turning in the housing. Inclined guide faces (21,22) working in the axial direction are formed on the bush end furthest from the keyhole, mating faces on the ring bearing against them. On turning the bush, the ring slides towards the output member until this uncouples from the bush.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/0058 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7706 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7949 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639249 C1 19980115; EP 0833024 A2 19980401; EP 0833024 A3 19990609; EP 0833024 B1 20021211; ES 2188829 T3 20030701; US 5911766 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170825

2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-09-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170825

2017-08-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708932

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070826

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070827

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188829 T3

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708932 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991116

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI