Global Patent Index - EP 0833049 B1

EP 0833049 B1 2000-04-12 - Electrically actuated valve with continuous discharge in operation for canister regeneration

Title (en)

Electrically actuated valve with continuous discharge in operation for canister regeneration

Title (de)

Elektrisch gesteuertes Ventil mit stetigem Öffnen während des Betriebes für Kanisterwiederaufbereitung

Title (fr)

Vanne à commande électrique et à ouverture continue en fonctionnement, pour régénération de canister

Publication

EP 0833049 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402207 A

Priority

FR 9611744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0833049A1] Fuel vapour from the fuel tank of an internal combustion engine is absorbed by material in a vapour recovery canister and fed back into the fuel supply system by an electrically controlled valve (9) which has a solenoid (20,21) and return spring (22). In operation the solenoid opens the valve head (18) from it's seating (17) by an amount controlled by a varying rectangular current wave. The shape of the current wave is changed by a microcomputer (10) using data from sensors (23,24) which detect fuel admission pressure and oxygen in the exhaust gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/0836 (2013.01); F02M 2025/0845 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0833049 A1 19980401; EP 0833049 B1 20000412; DE 69701663 D1 20000518; DE 69701663 T2 20001123; ES 2146070 T3 20000716; FR 2753747 A1 19980327; FR 2753747 B1 19981127

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701663

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120923

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100924

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110916

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100924

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100923

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100923

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146070 T3

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701663 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1998-12-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

1998-12-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980502

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1998-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI