Global Patent Index - EP 0833318 A3

EP 0833318 A3 2000-08-30 - Magneto-optical recording medium, magneto-optical recording method, and magneto-optical recording apparatus

Title (en)

Magneto-optical recording medium, magneto-optical recording method, and magneto-optical recording apparatus

Title (de)

Magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungsmedium, -verfahren und -gerät

Title (fr)

Milieu, méthode et appareil d'enregistrement magnéto-optique

Publication

EP 0833318 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97307591 A

Priority

JP 25420096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0833318A2] A magneto-optical recording medium including at least a recording layer, and an auxiliary recording layer which achieves magnetostatic coupling with the recording layer. The auxiliary recording layer is in an in-plane magnetization state at temperatures lower than a recording temperature, and in a perpendicular magnetization state at temperatures not lower than the recording temperature. It is therefore possible to achieve a decrease in a recording magnetic field. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 11/10 (2006.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 11/10508 (2013.01); G11B 11/10591 (2013.01); G11B 11/10593 (2013.01); Y10S 428/90 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DY] EP 0596716 A2 19940511 - SHARP KK [JP]
  • [PA] US 5623458 A 19970422 - MATSUMOTO KOJI [JP], et al & JP H07244877 A 19950919 - FUJITSU LTD
  • [YA] EP 0586175 A1 19940309 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [Y] EP 0606498 A1 19940720 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
  • [A] EP 0595639 A2 19940504 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [A] EP 0608134 A2 19940727 - SHARP KK [JP]
  • [PA] EP 0740296 A2 19961030 - SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 637 (P - 1650) 25 November 1993 (1993-11-25) & DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9337, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L03, AN 93-290917, XP0020649741933793-290917ChL03
  • [A] TAMANOI K.; SHONO K.: "Magnetically-induced super resolution using magneto-static coupling", PROCEEDINGS OF MORIS '94; JOURNAL OF THE MAGNETIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, vol. 19, no. Suppl. S1, 27 September 1994 (1994-09-27) - 29 September 1994 (1994-09-29), TOKYO; JP, pages 421 - 424, XP002063556
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 370 (P - 1768) 12 July 1994 (1994-07-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 429 (P - 1785) 10 August 1994 (1994-08-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0833318 A2 19980401; EP 0833318 A3 20000830; EP 0833318 B1 20090527; DE 69739421 D1 20090709; JP 3660072 B2 20050615; JP H10106055 A 19980424; US 5985436 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-05-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-07-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69739421 P 20090709

2009-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-05-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB