Global Patent Index - EP 0833678 A4

EP 0833678 A4 2000-05-03 - FLUID DELIVERY APPARATUS

Title (en)

FLUID DELIVERY APPARATUS

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITENABGABEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION DE FLUIDE

Publication

EP 0833678 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96916654 A

Priority

  • US 9607744 W
  • US 45152095 A
  • US 54091495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9637253A1] This invention is an apparatus (370) for accurately infusing fluids into a patient at specific rates over an extended period of time. The apparatus is of a low profile, laminate construction having a stored energy source in the form of a distended membrane (406), which in cooperation with the base (372) of the apparatus defines one or more fluid reservoirs (388) each having a fluid inlet and a fluid outlet. The apparatus (370) further includes a novel, conformable ullage made of formable materials. The conformable ullage (404) uniquely conforms to the shape of elastomeric membrane (406) as the membrane (406) returns to its less distended configuration, and in so doing can move between a central chamber and a toroidal chamber formed in the cover of the apparatus. This arrangement will satisfy even the most stringent medicament delivery tolerance requirements, and will elegantly overcome the limitations of material selection encountered in devices embodying solely rigid ullage construction. Additionally, the infusion cannula (386) of the apparatus is connected to the base (372) in a novel manner which permits expeditious subdermal delivery to the patient via a cannula (386) which extends generally perpendicularly relative to the base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/152

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 37/00 (2006.01); A61M 5/14 (2006.01); A61M 5/152 (2006.01); A61M 5/142 (2006.01); A61M 5/158 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/14248 (2013.01); A61M 5/1409 (2013.01); A61M 5/1413 (2013.01); A61M 5/152 (2013.01); A61M 5/1407 (2013.01); A61M 2005/1581 (2013.01); A61M 2205/197 (2013.01); Y10S 128/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9637253 A1 19961128; AU 5933696 A 19961211; AU 719528 B2 20000511; BR 9608893 A 19990615; CA 2222214 A1 19961128; EP 0833678 A1 19980408; EP 0833678 A4 20000503; JP H11505753 A 19990525; MX 9709157 A 19980830; US 5716343 A 19980210; US 6068613 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 61M 5/152 A

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971217

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE