Global Patent Index - EP 0833692 B1

EP 0833692 B1 2001-03-21 - VIBRATING CONE CRUSHER

Title (en)

VIBRATING CONE CRUSHER

Title (de)

VIBRATIONS-KEGELBRECHER

Title (fr)

BROYEUR VIBRANT A CONE

Publication

EP 0833692 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96922092 A

Priority

  • FR 9600879 W
  • FR 9506964 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2735402A1] A vibrating cone crusher in which the material is crushed between a cone (24) and a frusto-conical ring (22) located therearound and including an annular frame (10) supporting said ring and a device (50, 53) for generating circular vibration in a horizontal plane (P-P), a holder (44) for the cone and a number of tie rods (52) connecting the frame to the cone holder. Vertical vibration that disrupts crusher operation may be neutralised or substantially reduced by positioning the centre of gravity of the cone (24) and the cone holder (44) and that of the frame (10) and the members (22, 56) supported thereon on the plane (P-P) of the vibratory forces, or in the immediate vicinity thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 2/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 2/042 (2013.01); B02C 2/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2735402 A1 19961220; FR 2735402 B1 19970814; AT 199843 T 20010415; AU 6308996 A 19970109; AU 707703 B2 19990715; BR 9608528 A 19991130; CA 2223019 A1 19961227; CA 2223019 C 20021112; CN 1087195 C 20020710; CN 1193290 A 19980916; DE 69612199 D1 20010426; DE 69612199 T2 20011108; EG 20761 A 20000131; EP 0833692 A1 19980408; EP 0833692 B1 20010321; ES 2159034 T3 20010916; JO 1922 B 19970115; MA 23906 A1 19961231; MX 9710031 A 19980830; NO 314716 B1 20030512; NO 975855 A 19980205; NO 975855 D0 19971212; NZ 311717 A 19991129; PT 833692 E 20010928; RU 2161071 C2 20001227; TR 9701603 T1 19980521; US 5996915 A 19991207; WO 9641680 A1 19961227; ZA 9605046 B 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160612

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160610

2016-07-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160610

2016-06-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69612199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110612

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FCB

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-12-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: F C B ALUMINIUM EN F C B CIMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159034

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: F C B ALUMINIUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-08-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: F C B CIMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199843

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990426

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL PT SE