Global Patent Index - EP 0833707 B1

EP 0833707 B1 2000-04-19 - INTERCHANGEABLE AND SECURE SWAGING TOOL

Title (en)

INTERCHANGEABLE AND SECURE SWAGING TOOL

Title (de)

AUSTAUSCHBARES UND SICHERES QUETSCHWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE SERTISSAGE INTERCHANGEABLE ET SUR

Publication

EP 0833707 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96920469 A

Priority

  • US 9607634 W
  • US 45227395 A
  • US 45226995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9637318A1] An interchangeable and secure swaging tool (10) for compressing a swage fitting (12) having a sleeve (28) onto a tube (14) includes: (i) a housing (16) defining a partially enclosed chamber (40); (ii) a movable element (18), typically a piston disposed within the chamber (40) and movable between a retracted position (102) and an extended position (104); (iii) a housing jaw (20) affixed to the housing (16); (iv) a movable jaw (22) attached to the movable element (18), movement of the movable element (18) from the retracted position (102) to the extended position (104) causes the movable jaw (22) to approach the housing jaw (20) along a fixed axis; and (v) first and second swaging adapters (24, 26). One swaging adapter is disposed in each jaw. The first swaging adapter (24) retains the sleeve (28) while the second swaging adapter (26) induces a radial swaging force to the sleeve (28) when the movable element (18) is moved from the retracted position (102) towards the extended position (104). At least one of the swaging adapters (24, 26) is removably attached to one of the jaws (20, 22) so that a different swaging adapter can be used for different types, styles or sizes of swage fittings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9637318 A1 19961128; DE 69607843 D1 20000525; DE 69607843 T2 20000817; EP 0833707 A1 19980408; EP 0833707 A4 19980819; EP 0833707 B1 20000419; ES 2145460 T3 20000701; JP H11506394 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160524

2016-06-29 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-01-11 [REG IE NF4A] ORDER MADE FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-09-07 [REG IE NE4A] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020525

2002-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010515

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010508

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010501

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145460 T3

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607843 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1998-08-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971223

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE