Global Patent Index - EP 0833728 B1

EP 0833728 B1 2000-10-04 - CONCRETE CURING APPARATUS

Title (en)

CONCRETE CURING APPARATUS

Title (de)

ERHÄRTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BETON

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE PRENDRE DU BETON

Publication

EP 0833728 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96920920 A

Priority

  • GB 9601417 W
  • GB 9512525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2302402A] Pipes of the type used in subterranean or submerged pipelines for the recovery of oil, gas, slurries or the like pipeable materials from a subterranean well are coated with concrete using apparatus comprising a plurality of mobile pipe carriers (15), an insulated enclosure (20) in which there is provided a controlled wet atmosphere maintained at an elevated temperature, said enclosure being sized to accommodate a multiplicity of pipes together with pipe carriers, and means (30, 30')for sequentially advancing said pipe carriers in continual succession through said insulated enclosure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/24; B28B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/24 (2006.01); B28B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/245 (2013.01); B28B 19/0038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2302402 A 19970115; GB 2302402 B 19991013; GB 9512525 D0 19950823; DK 0833728 T3 20001120; EP 0833728 A1 19980408; EP 0833728 B1 20001004; NO 311835 B1 20020204; NO 976051 A 19980220; NO 976051 D0 19971222; WO 9700764 A1 19970109

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-22 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160616

2016-06-20 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160617

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2008-11-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SHAWCOR LTD.

- Effective date: 20080617

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO APRA' BREVETTI

2000-11-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR IT NL

2000-05-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DK FR IT NL

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MULLEN, DOUGLAS, THOMAS

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANE, ALAN, GREGORY

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BREDERO PRICE COATERS LIMITED

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980119

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK FR IT NL