Global Patent Index - EP 0833766 B1

EP 0833766 B1 2001-02-14 - Railway vehicle with single-axle running gear

Title (en)

Railway vehicle with single-axle running gear

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM EINACHSIGEN LAUFWERK

Title (fr)

VEHICULE SUR RAILS A TRAIN DE ROULEMENT A ESSIEU SIMPLE

Publication

EP 0833766 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920684 A

Priority

  • DE 19617003 A
  • EP 9701873 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617003A1] On a railway vehicle with a single-axle running gear (2, 3) which pivots about a vertical axis (8) relative to an associated coach body (13) and which is linked to a control unit (15) which in turn depends on a sensor unit that is affected by the radius of the curvature of the track ahead, the sensor unit is equipped with an electric sensor and a downstream electric low-pass filter for the purpose of obtaining a simple control system. Following the low-pass filter a quasi-static output signal which has been cleared of noise will be available for the control of the actuator (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/00 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01); B61F 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/383 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617003 A1 19971030; DE 19617003 C2 20020801; AT 199138 T 20010215; AU 2697497 A 19971119; AU 700636 B2 19990107; CA 2225040 A1 19971106; CA 2225040 C 20010828; CN 1079754 C 20020227; CN 1189802 A 19980805; CZ 287922 B6 20010314; CZ 9800081 A3 19991215; EP 0833766 A1 19980408; EP 0833766 B1 20010214; HU 221874 B1 20030228; HU 9901459 A2 19990830; HU 9901459 A3 20010928; JP H10509403 A 19980914; PL 183677 B1 20020628; PL 324245 A1 19980511; RU 2143356 C1 19991227; SK 11998 A3 19990111; WO 9741022 A1 19971106; ZA 9703617 B 19971128

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-03-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2001-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-05-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-04-12 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG TRANSFER- DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702996 20010322

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199138 T 20010215

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RAILWAY VEHICLE WITH SINGLE-AXLE RUNNING GEAR

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RAILWAY VEHICLE WITH SINGLE-AXLE RUNNING GEAR

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990511

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB DAIMLER-BENZ TRANSPORTATION (TECHNOLOGY) GMBH

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL