Global Patent Index - EP 0833781 B1

EP 0833781 B1 2000-01-05 - PLASTIC CLOSURE CAP

Title (en)

PLASTIC CLOSURE CAP

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSKAPPE AUS KUNSTSTOFF

Title (fr)

OPERCULE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 0833781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96914039 A

Priority

  • CH 9600211 W
  • CH 176995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700210A1] A closure cap for closing containers has a closure floor (2), a jacket (3) and a tear-off ring (7). The latter is attached to the jacket (3) at connection points (8). To open the closure cap, force is exerted on the tear-off ring (7), thereby destroying two vertical tear lines (9) situated next to the connection points (8). This allows a region of the jacket (3) to bend outwards and makes opening the closure cap easier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/485 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700210 A1 19970103; AR 002141 A1 19980107; AU 5757896 A 19970115; AU 705426 B2 19990520; BR 9608509 A 19990608; CA 2222276 A1 19970103; CN 1193307 A 19980916; CO 4440587 A1 19970507; DE 59604123 D1 20000210; EP 0833781 A1 19980408; EP 0833781 B1 20000105; HU 9900237 A2 19990528; HU 9900237 A3 20000628; IL 122295 D0 19980405; JP H11511096 A 19990928; MX 9710142 A 19980329; PL 324077 A1 19980511; TR 199701624 T1 19980421; US 6116444 A 20000912; ZA 9605069 B 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CROWN CORK A.G.

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604123 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971212

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI