Global Patent Index - EP 0833887 B1

EP 0833887 B1 2000-01-19 - NONAQUEOUS, PARTICULATE-CONTAINING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

NONAQUEOUS, PARTICULATE-CONTAINING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

NICHTWÄSSERIGE, KÖRNCHEN ENTHALTENDE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES NON AQUEUSES CONTENANT DES PARTICULES

Publication

EP 0833887 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95924005 A

Priority

  • CA 2225596 A
  • CN 95197939 A
  • US 9507823 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700937A1] Disclosed are nonaqueous detergent compositions which are in the form of a liquid, paste or gel, said composition containing a bleach activator which is present as a divalent and/or trivalent metal salt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 3/3915 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 17/0004 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700937 A1 19970109; CA 2225596 A1 19970109; CN 1193994 A 19980923; EP 0833887 A1 19980408; EP 0833887 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-04-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20021201

2002-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020501

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514692 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990119

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971125

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT