Global Patent Index - EP 0833904 A4

EP 0833904 A4 2000-05-17 - FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR-14

Title (en)

FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR-14

Title (de)

FIBROBLASTEN-WACHSTUMSFAKTOR-14

Title (fr)

FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES FIBROBLASTES 14

Publication

EP 0833904 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95921454 A

Priority

  • CA 2212992 A
  • US 9506730 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639506A1] Disclosed is a human Fibroblast growth factor-14 polypeptide and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide. Also provided is a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for promoting wound healing, for example as a result of burns and ulcers, to prevent neuronal damage due to/associated with stroke and promote neuronal growth, and to prevent skin aging and hair loss, to stimulate angiogenesis, mesodermal induction in early embryos and limb regeneration. Antagonists against such polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to prevent abnormal cellular proliferation, hyper-vascular diseases and epithelial lens cell proliferation are also disclosed. Diagnostic methods for detecting mutations in the coding sequence and alterations in the concentration of the polypeptides in a sample derived from a host are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C12N 15/18; C07K 14/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/50 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002131010, Database accession no. T27215
  • [A] GOSPODAROWICZ, D.: "Fibroblast growth factors: from genes to clinical applications", CELL BIOLOGY REVIEWS, vol. 25, no. 4, 1991, pages 307 - 314, XP002058994
  • [T] SMALLWOOD, P.M. ET AL.: "Fibroblast growth factor (FGF) homologous factors: New members of the FGF family implicated in nervous system development", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, vol. 93, no. 18, 3 September 1996 (1996-09-03), pages 9850 - 9857, XP002058996
  • See also references of WO 9639506A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639506 A1 19961212; AU 2653095 A 19961224; AU 702131 B2 19990211; CA 2212992 A1 19961212; EP 0833904 A1 19980408; EP 0833904 A4 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050225

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971002

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE