Global Patent Index - EP 0833965 B1

EP 0833965 B1 2002-09-25 - INTERMEDIATE CARD AND A WEB-PRODUCTION PROCESS

Title (en)

INTERMEDIATE CARD AND A WEB-PRODUCTION PROCESS

Title (de)

VLIESKREMPEL, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR VLIESHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CARDE DE VOILE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE VOILE

Publication

EP 0833965 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922010 A

Priority

  • DE 19521778 A
  • EP 9602622 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19521778A1] An intermediate card for producing a web from fibrous material is provided with a main cylinder (1); two web-forming rollers (2, 4; 2, 6) which engage with the main cylinder (1) and each take off one card web each from the main cylinder (1); a doffer device (6, 8) downstream of the web-forming rollers (2, 4; 2, 6); a common roller (6, 10, 12) upstream of the take-off device (14, 16) which doubles at least two card webs (3, 5) taken from the main cylinder (1) by the web-forming rollers (2, 4; 2, 6); and a take-off device (14, 16). It is proposed that at least one of the web-forming rollers (2, 4) located between the main cylinder (1) and take-off device (14, 16) should be a random roller with an associated centrifugal trough and with fittings for producing a random position of the card web (3, 5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/04; D01G 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/04 (2006.01); D01G 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/04 (2013.01); D01G 15/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521778 A1 19970102; EP 0833965 A1 19980408; EP 0833965 B1 20020925; US 6073313 A 20000613; WO 9700984 A1 19970109

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DILO JOHANN PHILIPP

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2004-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609729 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DILO, JOHANN, PHILIPP

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981202

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971217

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT