Global Patent Index - EP 0833968 B1

EP 0833968 B1 2000-05-24 - LOOM ROTOR WITH RETENTION PLATES

Title (en)

LOOM ROTOR WITH RETENTION PLATES

Title (de)

WEBROTOR MIT ANSCHLAGLAMELLEN

Title (fr)

ROTOR D'UN METIER A TISSER, DOTE DE LAMELLES DE BUTEE

Publication

EP 0833968 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909000 A

Priority

  • CH 9600157 W
  • CH 182495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700986A1] The invention concerns the rotor (1) of a shed of course weaving machine, the rotor having retention plates (3a, 3b) running round the surface of the rotor in the direction of rotation (7), the rotor (1) having a shaft (8) and the retention plates (3a, 3b) being disposed in such a way round the rotor that successive plates are staggered with respect to each other in the rotational direction of the shaft (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/00 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700986 A1 19970109; AU 5267996 A 19970122; DE 59605313 D1 20000629; EP 0833968 A1 19980408; EP 0833968 B1 20000524; JP H11507998 A 19990713; US 5947163 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050426

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981029

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970808

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT