Global Patent Index - EP 0833987 B1

EP 0833987 B1 2001-01-24 - CONTINUOUSLY REINFORCED DIAPHRAGM WALL, METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION AND FORMWORK THEREFOR

Title (en)

CONTINUOUSLY REINFORCED DIAPHRAGM WALL, METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION AND FORMWORK THEREFOR

Title (de)

DURCHGEHEND VERSTÄRKTE TRENNWAND, ZUGEHORIGE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND SCHALUNG

Title (fr)

PAROI MOULEE A ARMATURE CONTINUE, PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE TELLE PAROI ET COFFRAGE POUR REALISER CETTE PAROI

Publication

EP 0833987 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97920797 A

Priority

  • FR 9700715 W
  • FR 9604947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740233A1] The invention concerns a diaphragm wall consisting of a series of panels attached at their lateral extremities and constructed by casting a binder in adjacent excavated trench sections extending into one another, each panel comprising reinforcement, the said wall comprising also linking means between the reinforcements of adjacent panels. The linking means (24, 44) are separated from the said reinforcements (22, 42) and comprise an anchoring element (24) with one extremity fitted with at least a first vertically locking element (28, 30) and the other extremity engaging into one of the said panels (22), and a linking element (44) with one extremity equipped with at least a second locking element (46, 48) capable of cooperating with the first locking element and the other extremity engaging into the other of the said panels (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/20 (2006.01); E02D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740233 A1 19971030; DE 69703959 D1 20010301; DE 69703959 T2 20010523; EP 0833987 A1 19980408; EP 0833987 B1 20010124; ES 2154901 T3 20010416; FR 2747703 A1 19971024; FR 2747703 B1 19990507; JP 3914576 B2 20070516; JP H11508341 A 19990721; US 6052963 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130422

2014-06-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140609

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130517

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130415

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIE DU SOL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-04-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIETLIN & CIE SA

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154901

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703959

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980217

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI