Global Patent Index - EP 0834011 B1

EP 0834011 B1 2000-05-31 - INTAKE SILENCER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

INTAKE SILENCER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

ANSAUGSCHALLDÄMPFER UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

SILENCIEUX D'ASPIRATION POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0834011 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920737 A

Priority

  • DE 19615917 A
  • EP 9702038 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19615917A1] An intake silencer is designed as a broadband silencer for noises caused by intake of combustion air into internal combustion engines. To achieve the broadband effect, an axial sequence of resonator chambers (9) with different volumes is formed by partitions which extend transversely to the intake pipe in a resonator that surrounds the intake pipe (2). Each resonator chamber (9) communicates through openings (7) in the wall of the intake pipe with the air sucked through the intake pipe (2). By matching the open surface area of the openings (7), the thickness of the wall of the intake pipe (2) in the area of the openings and the volume of the resonator chambers (9), a continuous broadband silencing may be set even over a wide frequency range, the range of practical interest in the present application extending combustion from to 1 to 10 kHz. In motor vehicles with an internal combustion engine, a supercharger and an air charge cooler, the intake silencer is advantageously arranged in the pressure pipe joint of the supercharger, directly behind it or integrated therein, but in any case at a certain distance upstream of the air charge cooler.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1266 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615917 A1 19971030; EP 0834011 A1 19980408; EP 0834011 B1 20000531; EP 0834011 B2 20041027; ES 2146465 T3 20000801; ES 2146465 T5 20050416; US 5979598 A 19991109; WO 9740271 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-09-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-10-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2004-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WOCO INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH

2001-04-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146465 T3

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701802 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980430

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR