Global Patent Index - EP 0834043 B1

EP 0834043 B1 2000-02-09 - FLOW CONTROL, SPECIALLY FOR AN INSTANTANEOUS WATER HEATER

Title (en)

FLOW CONTROL, SPECIALLY FOR AN INSTANTANEOUS WATER HEATER

Title (de)

ARMATUR, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN DURCHLAUF-WASSERERHITZER

Title (fr)

COMMANDE DE DEBIT, NOTAMMENT POUR CHAUFFE-EAU INSTANTANE

Publication

EP 0834043 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95923262 A

Priority

  • DE 4425200 A
  • EP 9502208 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4425200A1] The present invention is to develop a flow control of the stated kind in which the furring of the rod projecting from the water containing housing (2) is reduced and the effect of such fur on the control behaviour is completely eliminated. This problem is solved in that the control movement of the diaphragm (24) in the water containing housing (2) is transmitted to a lever (3), the pivot of which is formed by a sealed shaft (4) firmly secured to said lever (3) and leading to the outside of the water containing housing (2). At the same time, the shaft (4) is also the pivot of a second lever (5) also firmly secured to it. The lifting movement of the first lever (3) is thus converted via the shaft (4) to the exterior as a rotary movement and then the rotary movement of the shaft (4) is reconverted by the second lever (5) into a lifting movement to control the gas flow. The flow control is used to control the gas flow depending on the water flow, especially for instantaneous water heaters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/087 (2013.01); F23N 2025/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01); F23N 2035/20 (2013.01); Y10T 137/2511 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4425200 A1 19960118; CA 2194584 A1 19960201; CA 2194584 C 20070515; CZ 289761 B6 20020417; CZ 9700080 A3 19970514; DE 59507800 D1 20000316; EP 0834043 A1 19980408; EP 0834043 B1 20000209; ES 2144616 T3 20000616; HU 219964 B 20011028; HU T77508 A 19980528; IL 114552 D0 19951127; PL 177671 B1 19991231; PL 318112 A1 19970512; PT 834043 E 20000731; US 5875807 A 19990302; WO 9602795 A1 19960201; ZA 9505734 B 19960529

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507800

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507800

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130609

2014-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130608

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144616 T3

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INVENTION S.N.C.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507800 20000316

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981020

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970415

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT