Global Patent Index - EP 0834263 B1

EP 0834263 B1 2000-05-03 - Pipe cleaner

Title (en)

Pipe cleaner

Title (de)

Pfeifenreiniger

Title (fr)

Cure-pipe

Publication

EP 0834263 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112251 A

Priority

DE 29617167 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834263A1] The pipe cleaner (1;19) has a symmetric rotation cleaning body (3;16;21), made from absorbent material, with a grip piece (2;20) built from the rotation body. The grip piece has a coaxial pin projection (9;24), which can be wound and/or rotated in a coaxial recess (10;25) of the cleaning body. The diameter of the grip piece may be between 1-2 cm, and it may also have a friction-jacket covering, which may be pimpled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24F 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24F 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24F 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617167 U1 19961128; EP 0834263 A1 19980408; EP 0834263 B1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701563 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE