Global Patent Index - EP 0834265 B1

EP 0834265 B1 2002-11-27 - Convertible clothing

Title (en)

Convertible clothing

Title (de)

Umwandelbares Bekleidungsstück

Title (fr)

Vêtement transformable

Publication

EP 0834265 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116655 A

Priority

DE 19640815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834265A2] The outer garment to cover the upper part of the body, such as a body stocking, has a section (108) at the top of the garment body (102) containing the neck (104), which can be detached from the garment (102). The two sleeves (106a,106b) can also be detached. The detached sections can be attached again as required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834265 A2 19980408; EP 0834265 A3 19981230; EP 0834265 B1 20021127; AT 228316 T 20021215; DE 19640815 C1 19980520

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2006-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040924

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708810 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228316 T 20021215

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-02-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990630

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI