Global patent index - EP 0834271 A3

EP 0834271 A3 2000-01-26 - Sitting furniture with tiltable seat and backrest

Title (en)

Sitting furniture with tiltable seat and backrest

Title (de)

Sitzmöbel mit neigbarem Sitz und Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise avec siège et dossier basculants

Publication

EP 0834271 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115667 A

Priority

DE 19640564 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834271A2] The chair has a support column (14) which has a flange (3) which stretches underneath the seat (2) to the bottom of the front edge of the seat. A first bearing (A) is arranged at the front of the flange. A second bearing (D) is provided at the upper end of the support column in which a connecting rod mounting (4) is rotatably supported. The mounting has an eccentric third bearing (C). A connecting rod (8) is supported in the third bearing and is rigidly connected at an angle with the backrest (1). The connecting rod has a fourth bearing (B) between its connection with the backrest and its joint to the mounting (4). The seat is supported in its rear region in the fourth bearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A47C 3/026

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19640564 A1 19980402; AT 226799 T 20021115; EP 0834271 A2 19980408; EP 0834271 A3 20000126; EP 0834271 B1 20021030; ES 2185853 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040911

2005-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050910

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040910

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040911

2004-09-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-09-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-09-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-09-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-08-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-08-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2185853

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59708611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021205

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 226799

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 1/032 A, 7A 47C 3/026 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL