Global Patent Index - EP 0834275 B1

EP 0834275 B1 2001-12-19 - Roman shade with winding axis with an attachment means for the ends of the drawing cords

Title (en)

Roman shade with winding axis with an attachment means for the ends of the drawing cords

Title (de)

Raffvorhang mit einer Aufspulwelle mit einer Befestigung für die Enden von Zugschnüren

Title (fr)

Rideau plissé avec un axe d'enroulement comprenant une fixation pour les extrémités des cordons de tirage

Publication

EP 0834275 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100028 A

Priority

DE 29617275 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834275A2] The curtain has pull cords (150) whose ends are fastened onto at least one fastening ring (20) pushed over a winding shaft (100). This shaft is fixed to a mounting bar (10) and has a number of cord guides (16). The ring has a cord collector (25) on its periphery. The ring is preferably attached to the shaft by a clamp or screw connection (26), or it may be formed from the shaft's material. The collector preferably comprises a shaped body which is fixed to the ring or removably attached to it. The ends of the cords may be attached to the collector by knots, clamps or clips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/14 (2006.01); E06B 9/322 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/322 (2013.01); E06B 9/262 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617275 U1 19961128; AT 210936 T 20020115; DK 0834275 T3 20020218; EP 0834275 A2 19980408; EP 0834275 A3 19980916; EP 0834275 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080103

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-01 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PROSCH DIETER

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-02-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705864 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210936 T 20020115

2001-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. TECN. INGG. SIMONI - DE BLASIO

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROMAN SHADE WITH WINDING AXIS WITH AN ATTACHMENT MEANS FOR THE ENDS OF THE DRAWING CORDS

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000719

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981024

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE