Global Patent Index - EP 0834355 B1

EP 0834355 B1 2001-12-12 - Cooling bed for rails

Title (en)

Cooling bed for rails

Title (de)

Kühlbett für Schienen

Title (fr)

Lit de refroidissement pour rails

Publication

EP 0834355 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116481 A

Priority

DE 19639482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2216350A1] A cooling bed for rails (3) with an apparatus (12) which is intended for transferring the rails (3) onto the cooling bed (1) from an infeeding roller table (2) and is set up to bend the rails (3) counter to the bending which they undergo during cooling is constructed as follows: Said apparatus (12) has supports (25) which can be raised and lowered, can be displaced into the cooling bed (1) from the roller table (2) and are intended for the rails (3). In each case one abutment which is directed towards the underside of the rail foot and one abutment which is directed towards the top side of the rail foot are arranged on supports (25). The displacement paths of the supports (25) are controlled in accordance with the desired bending. The front abutment (37), as seen in the direction of displacement, can be let down into the support (25) by pivoting forwards and downwards. The rear abutment (39), as seen in the direction of displacement, can be drawn back behind a shoulder of the support (25) by pivoting upwards and rearwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/085 (2006.01); B21B 43/00 (2006.01); B21D 3/10 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 43/003 (2013.01); B21B 39/004 (2013.01); B21B 43/02 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0071 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639482 A1 19980402; AT 210513 T 20011215; CA 2216350 A1 19980326; EP 0834355 A1 19980408; EP 0834355 B1 20011212; ES 2168565 T3 20020616; JP H10175013 A 19980630; TW 344684 B 19981111; US 5913930 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170923

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170921

2017-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210513 T

- Effective date: 20170922

2017-10-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170921

2017-09-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705753

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705753

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705753

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

2004-05-26 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040108

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS MEER GMBH

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168565 T3

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705753 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210513 T 20011215

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000526

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI